EP1425040 - IN VIVO ACTIVATION OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS FOR ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES INDUCED BY VIRUS LIKE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuros Biosciences AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Schlieren / CH | [2016/21] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Cytos Biotechnology AG Wagistrasse 25 8952 Zürich-Schlieren / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACHMANN, Martin F. Goldackerweg 8 CH- 8472 Seuzach / CH | 02 /
STORNI, Tazio Via Aldesago 10 CH-6962 Viganello / CH | 03 /
LECHNER, Franziska Davidsrain 19 CH- 4056 Basel / CH | [2004/32] |
Former [2004/24] | 01 /
BACHMANN, Martin, F. Tachlisbrunnenstrasse 30 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | ||
02 /
STORNI, Tazio Via Aldesago 10 CH-6962 Viganello / CH | |||
03 /
LECHNER, Franziska Froschaugasse 12 CH-8001 Zürich / CH | Representative(s) | Latscha Schöllhorn Partner AG Grellingerstrasse 60 4052 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Wichmann, Hendrik, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/24] | Wichmann, Hendrik, Dr. Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn, Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783338.3 | 16.09.2002 | [2004/24] | WO2002IB04252 | Priority number, date | US20010318967P | 14.09.2001 Original published format: US 318967 P | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03024480 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1425040 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61K39/292 (US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/001104 (EP,US);
A61K39/001129 (EP,US);
A61K39/001151 (EP,US);
A61K39/001156 (EP,US);
A61K39/001171 (EP,US);
A61K39/001182 (EP,US);
A61K39/001186 (EP,US);
A61K39/001191 (EP,US);
A61K39/001192 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55516 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6075 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (US);
C12N2730/10123 (US);
C12N2730/10134 (US);
C12N2730/10141 (US);
C12N2760/10034 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEIGERUNG DER DURCH VIRUSÄHNLICHE PARTIKEL HERVORGERUFENEN IMMUNANTWORT DURCH IN-VIVO AKTIVIERUNG VON ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIERENDEN ZELLEN | [2004/24] | English: | IN VIVO ACTIVATION OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS FOR ENHANCEMENT OF IMMUNE RESPONSES INDUCED BY VIRUS LIKE PARTICLES | [2004/24] | French: | ACTIVATION IN VIVO DE CELLULES PRESENTANT UN ANTIGENE EN VUE D'AUGMENTER LES REPONSES IMMUNES INDUITES PAR DES PARTICULES DE TYPE VIRUS | [2004/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.02.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0032227 (CYTOS BIOTECHNOLOGY AG [CH]); | [X]WO0037610 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al); | [X]WO0039304 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [X]WO0062800 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al); | [A]WO0156603 (TANOX INC [US]); | [A]WO0158478 (GENVEC INC [US], et al); |