Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7002284 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2006 | B2 | US2004095046 | 20.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2002300116 | 15.10.2002 | JP0212310 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007240540 | Global Dossier | 20.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2007118707 | 27.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1437569 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2012 | B1 | EP1437569 | 05.05.2010 | A4 | EP1437569 | 14.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2002300116 | 15.10.2002 | JP0212310 | 26.11.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03052350 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2002300116 | 15.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3972790B | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B2 | JP2003227719 | 15.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2002300116 | 15.10.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100510630C | 08.07.2009 | C | CN1596362 | 16.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001360560 | 27.11.2001 | JP2002300116 | 15.10.2002 |