03.04.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
25.04.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
22.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.04.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.11.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
01.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
03.05.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.12.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] |
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2004 |
Change - inventor |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
24.08.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.07.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
15.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.05.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
24.05.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|