EP1449724 - INFLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. Mainichi Intecio 3-4-5, Umeda Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Daicel Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1 Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Naoki 208, Shosha HimejI-shi, Hyogo 671-2201 / JP | 02 /
IWAI, Yasunori 7-23-705, Nakanohonmachi Shijyonawate-shi, Osaka 575-0051 / JP | 03 /
KATSUDA, Nobuyuki 4-2-2, Ohtsucho, Ohtsu-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1146 / JP | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
MATSUDA, Naoki 3-343, 500, Kamiyobe, Yobe-ku HimejI-shi, Hyogo 671-1262 / JP | ||
02 /
IWAI, Yasunori 7-23-705, Nakanohonmachi Shijyonawate-shi, Osaka 575-0051 / JP | |||
03 /
KATSUDA, Nobuyuki 4-2-2, Ohtsucho, Ohtsu-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1146 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783660.0 | 27.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002JP12389 | Priority number, date | JP20010367283 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001367283 | JP20010367536 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001367536 | JP20020234431 | 12.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002234431 | JP20020258010 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002258010 | JP20020264946 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002264946 | JP20020323737 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002323737 | [2004/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045739 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449724 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449724 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/26, B01J7/00 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B60R21/272 (EP);
B60R21/261 (EP);
C06D5/00 (EP);
C06D5/06 (EP);
B60R2021/2633 (EP);
B60R2021/2648 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR [2008/22] |
Former [2004/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUFBLASVORRICHTUNG | [2004/35] | English: | INFLATOR | [2004/35] | French: | GONFLEUR | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2004 | Translation filed | 19.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 18.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07018732.3 / EP1867532 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.05.2008 | [2009/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0602862 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [X] 52 * abstract * [A] 1,3,19,41; | [A]US5615912 (O'LOUGHLIN JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1,3,19,41* abstract *; | [A]US5836610 (RINK KARL K [US], et al) [A] 1,3,19,41 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO9915376 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]); | [A]JPH0976870 (OEA INC); | [A]WO9915377 (AUTOLIV ASP INC [US]) | by applicant | JPH0976870 | US3966226 | US4018457 | JPH08282427 | US6189922 | JPS4410443B | JP2002166817 | JPH02963086 |