EP1457258 - CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBONS AND THE OXYGEN-CONTAINING DERIVATIVES THEREOF OBTAINED FROM SYNGAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT KATALIZA IMENI G.K. BORESKOVA SIBIRSKOGO OTDELENIA ROSSIISKOI AKADEMII NAUK pr. Akademika Lavrentieva, 5 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states INSTITUT KATALIZA IMENI G.K. BORESKOVA SIBIRSKOGO OTDELENIA ROSSIISKOI AKADEMII NAUK pr. Akademika Lavrentieva, 5 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITENBERG, Izabella Shenderovna ul. Akademicheskaya, 25-40 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | 02 /
KIRILLOV, Valerii Alexandrovich ul. Pravdy, 1-5 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | 03 /
KUZIN, Nikolai Alekseevich ul. Demakova, 9-131 Novosibirsk, 630128 / RU | 04 /
PARMON, Valentin Nikolaevich ul. Voevodskogo, 1-1 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | 05 /
SIPATROV, Anatoly Gennadyevich ul. Vesenny proezd, 4-26 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | 06 /
KHASIN, Alexandr Alexandrovich ul. Kosmodamianskaya, 4/22b-133 Moscow, 113035 / RU | 07 /
CHERMASHENTSEVA, Galina Konstantinovna ul. Morskoi prospekt, 20-3 Novosibirsk, 630090 / RU | 08 /
YURYEVA, Tamara Mihailovna ul. Kosmodamianskaya 4/22b-133 Moscow, 113035 / RU | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783882.0 | 25.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002RU00507 | Priority number, date | RU20010135572 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: RU 2001135572 | [2004/38] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053568 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457258 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 03.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/74, B01J23/89, C07C1/04 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C07C1/0425 (EP,US);
B01J23/75 (EP,US);
B01J23/755 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,US);
B01J35/60 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/0425, C07C11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN UND DEREN SAUERSTOFFHALTIGEN DERIVATEN AUS SYNGAS | [2004/38] | English: | CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING HYDROCARBONS AND THE OXYGEN-CONTAINING DERIVATIVES THEREOF OBTAINED FROM SYNGAS | [2004/38] | French: | CATALYSEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'HYDROCARBURES ET DE LEURS DERIVES CONTENANT L'OXYGENE A PARTIR DU GAZ DE SYNTHESE | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2004 | Translation filed | 16.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 25.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2006 | 30.11.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4409131 (FETCHIN JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]EP0092878 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-13 * example - *; | [X]FR2556235 (PRO CATALYSE [FR]) [X] 1-13 * example - *; | [X]US4605679 (KOBYLINSKI THADDEUS P [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * example - *; | [X]WO9604072 (CROSFIELD JOSEPH & SONS [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * example - *; | [X] - VAN DE LOOSDRECHT J ET AL, "Preparation and properties of supported cobalt catalysts for Fischer-Tropsch synthesis", APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970313), vol. 150, no. 2, ISSN 0926-860X, pages 365 - 376, XP004338059 [X] 1-13 * Experimental catalyst preparation ischer-Tropsch synthesis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0926-860X(96)00306-7 | International search | [A]EP0510770 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US5169821 (SOLED STUART L [US], et al); | [A]EP0857513 (AGIP PETROLI [IT], et al); | [A]RU2161067 (ADZHIP PETROLI S P A [IT], et al) |