EP1578911 - FLEA HEAD, NERVE CORD, HINDGUT AND MALPIGHIAN TUBULE NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES, PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heska Corporation 1613 Prospect Parkway Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDT, Kevin, S. 7114 Woodrow Dr. Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US | 02 /
GAINES, Patrick, J. 1406 Glen Haven Drive Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | 03 /
STINCHCOMB, Dan, T. 8409 South County Road 3 Fort Collins, CO 80528 / US | 04 /
WISNEWSKI, Nancy 4219 Beaver Creek Drive Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Pilkington, Stephanie Joan, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02784031.3 | 04.10.2002 | [2005/39] | WO2002US31878 | Priority number, date | US20010328347P | 10.10.2001 Original published format: US 328347 P | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03031577 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1578911 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/4359 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE UND PROTEINE DES KOPFS, NERVENSTRANGS, HINTERDARMS UND MALPIGHISCHEN GEFÄSSES DES FLOHS, SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/39] | English: | FLEA HEAD, NERVE CORD, HINDGUT AND MALPIGHIAN TUBULE NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES, PROTEINS AND USES THEREOF | [2005/39] | French: | MOLECULES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET PROTEINES ISSUES DE LA TETE, DE LA MOELLE EPINIERE, DE L'INTESTIN POSTERIEUR ET DU TUBE DE MALPIGHI DE PUCES ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 10.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 29.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |