EP1441957 - REFORMED CAN END AND METHOD THEREFORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rexam Beverage Can Company 8770 West Bryn Mawr Avenue Chicago IL 60631-3542 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Rexam Beverage Can Company 8770 West Bryn Mawr Chicago, IL 60632-3542 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURNER, Timothy 614 Valley View Drive Pecatonica, IL 61063 / US | 02 /
FORREST, Randy, G. 700 Park Plaine Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US | 03 /
GOPALASWAMY, Rajesh 1109 Stanton Lake Zurich, IL 60047 / US | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2008/04] | Hickinson, Katie Louise, et al Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester, M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | Robertson, James Alexander, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence, Highbank House Exchange Street Stockport, Cheshire SK3 0ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02784049.5 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US32074 | Priority number, date | US20010041827 | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 41827 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035494 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441957 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441957 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/50, B21D51/38 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
B65D17/08 (EP,US);
B21D51/38 (EP,US);
B65D17/4012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Title | German: | UMGEFORMTES DOSENENDE UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/32] | English: | REFORMED CAN END AND METHOD THEREFORE | [2004/32] | French: | EXTREMITE REFORMEE DE BOITE BOISSON ET PROCEDE A CET EFFET | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.04.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.06.2012 | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | IE | 08.10.2012 | LU | 08.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IE | 08.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
SE | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0103074 (BALL CORP [US]) [Y] 15,28-30,32 * page 7, line 27 * * figure 6 *[A] 1,7,14,20,24,27; | [YA]EP0785037 (BALL CORP [US]) [Y] 4,5 * column 10, line 52 - column 13, line 37 * * figures 3A-3C * [A] 1; | [XAY]US6024239 (TURNER TIMOTHY L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,9-11,13,14,16,17,19,20,22-24,26,27 * column 3, lines 7-12 * * column 5, lines 9-13 * * column 11, line 64 - column 12, line 48 * * figure 11 * [A] 18,31 [Y] 4,5,8,12,15,25,28-30,32; | [XAY]US6065634 (BRIFCANI MOUAYED MAMDOOH [GB], et al) [X] 20,21 * column 3, lines 27-37 * * figures 4,5 * [A] 1,7,20,24 [Y] 8,12,25 |