EP1441971 - SELF-VENTING INK CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. North Second Street Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Sonoco Development, Inc. North Second Street Hartsville, South Carolina 29550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWSON, Rebecca 3327 Stafford Court Florence, SC 29501 / US | 02 /
LOWRY, James 405 Treeshore Lane Franklin, TN 37069-8219 / US | 03 /
HODGE, Wylie 1433 Lynn Road Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
LAWSON, Rebecca 3327 Stafford Court Florence, SC 29501 / US | ||
02 /
LOWRY, James 3314 W. Hampton Pointe Drive Florence, SC 29501 / US | |||
03 /
HODGE, Wylie 1433 Lynn Road Hartsville, SC 29550 / US | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02784187.3 | 21.10.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US33552 | Priority number, date | US20010333030P | 05.11.2001 Original published format: US 333030 P | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040001 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441971 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/54 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US);
B41J2/17596 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTLÜFTENDE TINTENPATRONE | [2004/32] | English: | SELF-VENTING INK CARTRIDGE | [2004/32] | French: | CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE AUTOVENTILEE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 14.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9110529U (PRESTELE, EUGEN, 8900 AUGSBURG, DE) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19710756 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1094602 (MATERIAL ENG TECH LAB INC) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0900599 (SONOCO PRODUCTS CO [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1020167 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [DA]US6192797 (REA KEITH R [US], et al) [DA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [DAP]US6419351 (LAWSON REBECCA A [US], et al) [DAP] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4854485 (COLLINS MALCOLM G [GB]); | [A]US5878922 (BORING DAVID E [US]) | by applicant | US6419351 | US6192797 |