EP1455958 - SORTING PLANT FOR SORTING ITEMS FED IN BULK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vorning Maskinfabrik ApS Industrivej 6 8830 Tjele / DK | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTENSEN, Kent Gartnerbakken 22, Hammershoej DK-8830 Tjele / DK | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Knudsen, Christian Egtved, et al PATRADE A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Knudsen, Christian Egtved, et al PATRADE A/S Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 02785084.1 | 28.10.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002DK00714 | Priority number, date | DK20010001759 | 26.11.2001 Original published format: DK 200101759 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045589 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455958 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455958 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/06, B65G47/24, B07B15/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
B65G47/22 (EP,US);
B65G47/1492 (EP,US);
B65G47/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | 16.06.2004 | LT | 16.06.2004 | LV | 16.06.2004 | MK | 16.06.2004 | RO | 16.06.2004 | SI | 16.06.2004 | Title | German: | SORTIERANLANGE ZUM SORTIEREN VON LOSE ZUGEFÜHRTEN OBJEKTEN | [2004/38] | English: | SORTING PLANT FOR SORTING ITEMS FED IN BULK | [2004/38] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRIAGE PERMETTANT DE TRIER DES ARTICLES ALIMENTES EN VRAC | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 15.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 17.08.2005 | EE | 17.08.2005 | SK | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | CY | 28.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | BG | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | PT | 17.01.2006 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | CZ | 17.08.2005 | |
EE | 17.08.2005 | ||
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CZ | 17.08.2005 | |
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | CZ | 17.08.2005 | |
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | CZ | 17.08.2005 | |
SK | 17.08.2005 | ||
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | CZ | 17.08.2005 | |
BG | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BG | 17.11.2005 | |
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
PT | 17.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | BG | 17.11.2005 | |
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BG | 17.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3866739 (SIKORSKI THADDEUS JOHN); | [A]US4889224 (DENKER STANLEY D [US]) |