EP1434973 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Change - French title | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | 11.09.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2015/42] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGL, Rainer Gerberstr. 12 83352 Altenmarkt / DE | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 02785137.7 | 01.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002EP10974 | Priority number, date | DE2001149174 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10149174 | [2004/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031916 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1434973 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434973 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1434973 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/244 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
G01D5/24476 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONSBESTIMMUNG | [2004/28] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING POSITION | [2004/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UNE POSITION | [2015/42] |
Former [2004/28] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER UNE POSITION | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 27.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
19.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
19.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
19.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH Opponent's representative Erk, Patrick Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.10.2012
19.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH Opponent's representative Strauss, Steffen Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | 15.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.01.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.03.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.08.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | LU | 01.10.2012 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | FR | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
AT | 31.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FR | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 11.01.2012 | |
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 11.01.2012 | |
BG | 11.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0293479 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,10 * abstract *; | [Y]DE4410955 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7,10,11,14 * the whole document *; | [YD] - D. MANN, "Verbesserte Auswertung von inkrementalen Gebersystemen durch Oversampling", LAGEREGELSEMINAR "FORTSCHRITTE IN DER REGELUNGS- UND ANTRIEBSTECHNIK", (19981113), pages 1 - 20, XP008013551 [YD] 1,2,7,10,11,14 * figure 11 * |