EP1455088 - SCAFFOLD FOR AEROGENERATORS HAVING A SHAFT WITH A VARIABLE SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benedicto Soler, Blanca Calle General Pardinas, n 33-5 15701 Santiago de Compostela / ES | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co., C/ Goya No. 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 02785432.2 | 02.11.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002ES00510 | Priority number, date | ES20010002444 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: ES 200102444 | [2004/37] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038277 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455088 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00, B66F11/04, E04G3/10 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
B66F11/04 (EP,ES);
F03D80/00 (ES);
F03D80/50 (EP,US);
E04G3/24 (EP);
E04G3/243 (EP);
E04G3/30 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | GERÜST FÜR AEROGENERATOREN MIT EINEM SCHAFT MIT VARIABLEM QUERSCHNITT | [2004/37] | English: | SCAFFOLD FOR AEROGENERATORS HAVING A SHAFT WITH A VARIABLE SECTION | [2004/37] | French: | ECHAFAUDAGE DESTINE A DES EOLIENNES A FUT DE SECTION VARIABLE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | Translation filed | 01.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]ES2036368T ; | [Y]DE4339638 (LUTTUSCHKA JAN [DE]); | [A]DE29603278U (BEYER REINHARD [DE], et al); | [A]DE29723595U (REINEKE GERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE29819391U (SIEBERT ANTONIUS J [DE], et al); | [YP]EP1179647 (RUND STAHL BAU GMBH & CO [AT]) |