EP1433017 - ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATOR, THE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND THE BLOCK FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Photline Technologies 11, rue des Véroniques 25770 Serre les Sapins / FR | [2004/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTE, Henri 11, rue des Véroniques F-25770 Serres les Sapins / FR | 02 /
HAUDEN, Jérôme 18, rue de Velotte F-25000 Besançon / FR | 03 /
MOLLIER, Pascal 5, rue de Lorraine F-25000 Besançon / FR | 04 /
CARENCO, Alain 4, rue Paul Henry Thilloy F-92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02785519.6 | 03.10.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002FR03381 | Priority number, date | FR20010012727 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0112727 | [2004/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03029881 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433017 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/035 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G02F1/0356 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | ELEKTROOPTISCHER MODULATOR, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND BLOCK ZU SEINEM BETRIEB | [2004/27] | English: | ELECTRO-OPTIC MODULATOR, THE PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND THE BLOCK FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2004/27] | French: | MODULATEUR ELECTRO-OPTIQUE, PROCEDE DE REALISATION ET BLOC POUR MISE EN OEUVRE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 22.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.09.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | 30.09.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.09.2004 | M02   Fee paid on   30.09.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2328756 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5886807 (CUMMINGS URI [US]) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0452938 (JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRON [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [A] - ARMENISE M N ET AL, "TRAVELING-WAVE ELECTROOPTICAL MODULATOR IN INHOMOGENEOUS LITHIUM NIOBATE", ALTA FREQUENZA, UFFICIO CENTRALE AEI-CEI. MILANO, IT, (19830501), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 212 - 214, XP002039230 [A] 1 * figure 1 * |