EP1452518 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/36] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID COMPOUND | ||
[2011/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2012/27] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YADA, Shuhei, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 02 /
OGAWA, Yasushi, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Yoshiro, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Kiyoshi, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | 05 /
TAKASAKI, Kenji, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | [2012/25] |
Former [2004/36] | 01 /
YADA, Shuhei, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | ||
02 /
OGAWA, Yasushi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | |||
03 /
SUZUKI, Yoshiro, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAHASHI, Kiyoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | |||
05 /
TAKASAKI, Kenji, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-0848 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02786024.6 | 04.12.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002JP12709 | Priority number, date | JP20010369636 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001369636 | JP20010371608 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001371608 | JP20010385168 | 18.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001385168 | JP20010392058 | 25.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001392058 | JP20020141162 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002141162 | JP20020141194 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002141194 | [2004/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048100 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1452518 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1452518 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/14, B01D3/24, B01D3/32, B01J8/22, B01J14/00, B01J19/00, B01J19/18 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
B01D3/14 (EP,US);
B01D3/225 (EP,US);
B01D3/24 (EP,US);
B01D3/322 (EP,US);
B01J14/00 (EP,US);
B01J19/006 (EP,US);
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B01J8/228 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00283 (EP,US);
B01J2208/003 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0084 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00006 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | C07C51/487, C07C57/05, C07C57/07, C07C51/25, C07C67/60, C07C69/54, B01J19/00, B01D3/00, B01D3/14, B01D3/24, B01D3/32 | ||
Former IPC [2004/36] | C07C51/487, C07C57/05, C07C57/07, C07C51/25, C07C67/60, C07C69/54, B01J19/00, B01D3/00 | Designated contracting states | ES, IT [2012/25] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (METH)ACRYLSÄUREVERBINDUNGEN | [2011/52] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID COMPOUNDS | [2011/52] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DES COMPOSES D'ACIDE (METH)ACRYLIQUE | [2011/52] |
Former [2004/36] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER (METH)ACRYLSÄUREVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2004/36] | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID COMPOUND | ||
Former [2004/36] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSE D'ACIDE (METH)ACRYLIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | Translation filed | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10190824.2 / EP2311789 | EP10190825.9 / EP2311790 | EP10190826.7 / EP2311791 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08183756 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [A]US5734075 (FAUCONET MICHEL [FR], et al); | [A]EP0887334 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) | by applicant | JPH08183756 | US6180819 |