|
24.04.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2012 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2006 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2006 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2004 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2004 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.2004 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
112 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
61 |