26.04.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
01.06.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
18.05.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
16.04.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.04.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.12.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
25.11.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
25.11.2011 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
25.11.2011 |
Change - English title |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
25.11.2011 |
Change - French title |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
16.11.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
09.11.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.09.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.05.2010 |
First examination report |
|
22.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
31.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
11.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2004 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
26.11.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
30.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
16.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
23.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|