Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007129571 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | US67424707 | 13.02.2007 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | US85922104 | 03.06.2004 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7348455 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2008 | B2 | US2004220426 | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004043451 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2003135721 | 14.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004043448 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2003135640 | 14.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3925401B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2007 | B2 | JP2003252824 | 10.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2002360879 | 12.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4008803B | Global Dossier | 14.11.2007 | B2 | JP2003246765 | 02.09.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2002359291 | 11.12.2002 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4192465B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2008 | B2 | JP2003171342 | 20.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4132799B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2008 | B2 | JP2003164703 | 10.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2311791 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2019 | B1 | EP2311791 | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | EP02786024 | 04.12.2002 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2311790 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2015 | B1 | EP2311790 | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | EP02786024 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2311789 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2015 | B1 | EP2311789 | 20.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | EP02786024 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002354084 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1452518 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | B1 | EP1452518 | 12.01.2005 | A4 | EP1452518 | 01.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0214697 | 05.02.2013 | B1 | BR0214697 | 14.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012016826 | 14.07.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | BR0214697 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122012016827 | 14.07.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | BR0214697 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2387564T | 26.09.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP0212709 | 04.12.2002 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2300515 | 10.06.2007 | C2 | RU2004120291 | 10.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03048100 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100494155C | 03.06.2009 | C | CN1610655 | 27.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1240662C | 08.02.2006 | C | CN1572775 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1247515C | 29.03.2006 | C | CN1572773 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1260201C | 21.06.2006 | C | CN1572776 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1260202C | 21.06.2006 | C | CN1562948 | 12.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1272304C | 30.08.2006 | C | CN1572774 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2547412T | 06.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2552378T | 27.11.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2715315T | 03.06.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2001369636 | 04.12.2001 | JP2002141194 | 16.05.2002 | JP2002141162 | 16.05.2002 | JP2001392058 | 25.12.2001 | JP2001371608 | 05.12.2001 | JP2001385168 | 18.12.2001 | Type | Divisional application | EP2311789 | EP2311790 | EP2311791 |