EP1459886 - LAMINATED FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Dupont Films Japan Limited 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome hiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Teijin Dupont Films Japan Limited 1-1, Uchisaiwaicho 2-chome hiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUYAMA, Shunsuke@Teijin DuPont Films Japan Ltd. Sagamihara Res. Ctr. 37-19, Oyama 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Hikaru@Teijin DuPont Films Japan Limited Sagaminara Research Ctr. 37-19, Oyama 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP | [2016/28] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
OKUYAMA, Shunsuke Teijin DuPont Films Japan Ltd. Sagamihara, Res. Ctr. 37-19, Oyama 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEUCHI, Hikaru Teijin DuPont Films Japan Limited Sagaminara Research Ctr. 37-19, Oyama 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 229-1105 / JP | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/43] |
Former [2004/39] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02786171.5 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002JP13366 | Priority number, date | JP20010399703 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001399703 | JP20010399704 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001399704 | JP20020276957 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002276957 | [2004/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03057484 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1459886 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459886 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/09, B32B27/36 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
G03F7/092 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/09 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/39] | B32B27/36, G03F7/09, H05K3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/28] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LAMINIERTE FOLIE | [2004/39] | English: | LAMINATED FILM | [2004/39] | French: | FEUILLE STRATIFIÉE | [2016/26] |
Former [2004/39] | FILM STRATIFIE | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2003 | Translation filed | 13.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 09.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.01.2017 | GB | 26.01.2017 | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/50] | FR | 02.01.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06161096 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] * abstract *; | [Y]EP0823660 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-4,6,8,9,11 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0905564 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [X] 1,7,10,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * [Y] 5,2-4,6,8,9,11; | [Y]US5981690 (LUSTIG STEVEN RAYMOND [US], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0149509 (MACDERMID GRAPHIC ARTS SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 | International search | [X]EP0823660 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2000275860 (TEIJIN LTD); | [X]JPH11240110 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH11349792 (TEIJIN LTD); | [XP]JP2002062661 (TEIJIN LTD); | [XP]JP2002278074 (TEIJIN LTD) |