EP1463536 - SANITIZING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SANITIZING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wen, Sheree 796 Longhill Road West Briarcliff Manor, NY 10510 / US | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/41] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 02786684.7 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/41] | WO2002US35720 | Priority number, date | US20010337654P | 07.11.2001 Original published format: US 337654 P | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03039608 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1463536 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/10, A61L2/12, A61L2/20, A23L3/28, A23L3/3409, B65B55/08, B65B55/10, B67C7/00, H05B3/00, H05B6/78 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A61L2/14 (EP,US);
A23L3/28 (EP,US);
A23L3/3409 (EP,US);
A61L2/10 (EP,US);
A61L2/12 (EP,US);
A61L2/20 (EP,US);
A61L2/202 (EP,US);
H05B3/0052 (EP,US);
H05B6/782 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | A61L9/00, A61L2/00, A62B7/08, B01J19/08, B01J10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2004/41] | English: | SANITIZING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SANITIZING ARTICLES | [2004/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DESINFECTION ET PROCEDE POUR DESINFECTER DES ARTICLES | [2004/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 07.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.2007 | 30.11.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2007 | 30.11.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009 | 30.11.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2009 | 30.11.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3321386 (OBJECTIFS CONSEIL [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * page 8 - page 22; figure 1; claims 1-9 *; | [X]US5897831 (JACOB ADIR [US], et al) [X] 7 * column 21, line 11 - column 22, line 47; figures 15,16; examples 21-23; claims 1,7,9,10 *; | [X]DE29916364U (HIRSCH MARIA [AT], et al) [X] 7* page 3, paragraph THREE - page 11; figures 1,2; claims 1-10 * | International search | [Y]US3926556 (BOUCHER RAYMOND MARCEL GUT); | [Y]US4207286 (BOUCHER RAYMOND M GUT [US]); | [Y]US5244629 (CAPUTO ROSS A [US], et al); | [Y]US5320805 (KRAMER DAVID N [US], et al) |