EP1446012 - COMBINATION BACTERIOLYTIC THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine 111 Market Place, Suite 906 Baltimore, MD 21202 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine Suite 906, 111 Market Place Baltimore, MD 21202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANG, Long 2225 Rogene Drive No. 101 Baltimore, MD 21209 / US | 02 /
KINZLER, Kenneth, W. 1403 Halkirk Way Bel Air, MD 21015 / US | 03 /
VOGELSTEIN, BERT 3700 Breton Way Baltimore, MD 21208 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
DANG, Long 2225 Rogene Drive, 101 Baltimore, MD 21209 / US | ||
02 /
KINZLER, Kenneth, W. 1403 Halkirk Way Bel Air, MD 21015 / US | |||
03 /
VOGELSTEIN, BERT 3700 Breton Way Baltimore, MD 21208 / US | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2004/34] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02786766.2 | 21.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002US37509 | Priority number, date | US20010331786P | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 331786 P | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03045153 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446012 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446012 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K38/05, A61K31/40, A61K31/675, A61P35/00, C12N1/20, C12R1/145 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A61K35/742 (EP,US);
A61K38/193 (EP,US);
A61K41/00 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K35/742, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/193, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K41/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/01] | C12N1/20, A61K35/66, A61K35/74 | ||
Former IPC [2004/34] | A01N63/00, A01N65/00, A61K48/00, C12N1/12, C12N1/20, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Title | German: | BAKTERIOLYTISCHE KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON TUMOREN | [2004/34] | English: | COMBINATION BACTERIOLYTIC THERAPY FOR THE TREATMENT OF TUMORS | [2004/34] | French: | THERAPIE BACTERIOLYTIQUE COMBINEE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE TUMEURS | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | IE | 21.11.2013 | LU | 21.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 21.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY] - EKLUND M W ET AL, "Relationship of bacteriophages to alpha toxin production in Clostridium novyi types A and B.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY. SEP 1976, (197609), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 793 - 803, XP002405800 [DX] 1-9 * abstract * * page 793, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 795; table 2 * * page 800, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 802, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 10-52 | [DXY] - EKLUND M W ET AL, "Interspecies conversion of clostridium botulinum type C to clostridium novyi type A by bacteriophage", SCIENCE 1974, (1974), vol. 186, no. 4162, pages 456 - 458, XP002405801 [DX] 1-9 * abstract * * page 456, column 3, paragraph 3 * [Y] 10-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.186.4162.456 | [Y] - MINTON N P ET AL, "Chemotherapeutic tumour targeting using clostridial spores", FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1995), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0168-6445, pages 357 - 364, XP002242524 [Y] 10-52 * page 358, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-6445(95)00009-2 | [Y] - MINTON N P ET AL, "Clostridia in Cancer Therapy", IN: BAHL H AND DÜRRE P EDITORS, CLOSTRIDIA - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND MEDICAL APPLICATIONS, WILEY-VCH, WEINHEIM, ISBN 3-527-30175-5, (20010215), pages 251 - 270, XP001247867 [Y] 10-52 * page 251 - page 254, paragraph 2 * * page 255, paragraph 4 - page 256, paragraph 2 * | [XY] - THEYS J ET AL, "IMPROVEMENT OF CLOSTRIDIUM TUMOUR TARGETING VECTORS EVALUATED IN RAT RHABDOMYOSARCOMAS", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (200102), vol. 30, no. 1, ISSN 0928-8244, pages 37 - 41, XP001097591 [X] 38,40,43-50 * abstract * * page 40, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 41, column 1, paragraph 3 * [Y] 10-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-8244(00)00231-5 | [XA] - HATHEWAY C L, "Toxigenic clostridia.", CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS. JAN 1990, (199001), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 0893-8512, pages 66 - 98, XP002408674 [X] 1,4,5 * page 83, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 83; table 7 * * page 68; table 1 * * page 82, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 84, column 2, paragraph 6 * [A] | International search | [XP] - DANG LONG H., "Combination bacteriolytic therapy for the treatment of experimental tumors", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20011218), vol. 98, no. 26, pages 15155 - 15160, XP003010304 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.251543698 | Examination | - DANG LONG H ET AL, "Targeting vascular and avascular compartments of tumors with C. novyi-NT and anti-microtubule agents", CANCER BIOLOGY AND THERAPY, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, (20040301), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 326 - 337, XP002483666 |