EP1440267 - OVER-PRESSURE PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAVER, Theodorus, Cornelis Volmerlaan 8 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | 02 /
PETTITT, Mark Volmerlaan 8 NL-2288 GD Rijswijk / NL | [2004/31] | Representative(s) | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O.Box 302 2501 CH The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/31] | Zeestraten, Albertus W. J. Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. P.O.Box 302 2501 CH The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 02787551.7 | 01.11.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002EP12279 | Priority number, date | EP20010309291 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: EP 01309291 | [2004/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038325 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440267 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1440267 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00, F16K17/04 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
F16K17/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16K37/0025 (KR);
F16K37/00 (EP,US);
F16K37/0041 (KR);
F16K37/0083 (KR);
F16K51/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/39] |
Former [2004/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERDRUCKSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2004/31] | English: | OVER-PRESSURE PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2004/31] | French: | SYSTEME DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURPRESSIONS | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 12.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3844310 (BRINDISI F) [A] 1,2* column A *; | [A]GB2062812 (FURMANITE INT LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4572237 (THOMPSON LEONARD J [US]) [A] 1 * column A *; | [A]US5836348 (OSTAND PAUL R [US]) [A] 1 * column A * |