EP1372460 - DEVICE FOR POSITIONING AT LEAST ONE OPTICAL COMPONENT INSIDE AN ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Karl Storz GmbH & Co. KG Mittelstrasse 8 78532 Tuttlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEHR, Ulrich Asternweg 14 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 02 /
HÖFIG, Siegfried Schönenbergstrasse 16 78570 Mühlheim / DE | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Heuckeroth, Volker, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Heuckeroth, Volker, Dr., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02787666.3 | 13.11.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP12705 | Priority number, date | DE2001157075 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10157075 | [2004/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03043489 | Date: | 30.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1372460 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372460 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, G02B23/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
A61B1/00188 (EP,US);
A61B1/00183 (EP,US);
A61B1/00195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/38] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM POSITIONIEREN ZUMINDEST EINES OPTISCHEN BAUELEMENTS INNERHALB EINES ENDOSKOPISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2004/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR POSITIONING AT LEAST ONE OPTICAL COMPONENT INSIDE AN ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM | [2004/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT D'AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT OPTIQUE A L'INTERIEUR D'UN SYSTEME ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 12.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE19713276 (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1-14 * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 35 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US2987960 (SHELDON GILBERT J) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-3 * * objective lens 52 mirrors 40, 42 *; | [A]DE2328595 (MACHIDA ENDOSCOPE CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph MITTE * * figure - *; | [A]US4862199 (CENTKOWSKI MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 5, line 32 - line 36 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US5978161 (LEMKE NORBERT [DE]) [A] 14 * abstract * * figure - * | by applicant | DE19713276 | DE19903437 |