EP1441692 - COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AMINO ACID N-ACYLATED ESTER AND A POLYAMIDE-STRUCTURED UV FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANDAU, Didier 46, rue de la Martinière F-95570 Bièvres / FR | 02 /
GOMBERT, Christèle 207, avenue Charles de Gaulle F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02788045.9 | 08.11.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002FR03839 | Priority number, date | FR20010014530 | 09.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114530 | [2004/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03039447 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441692 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441692 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61Q17/04 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/35 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/4966 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/32] | A61K7/42, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VON EINEM POLYAMID STUKTURIERTES MITTEL DAS EINEN N-ACYLIERTEN ESTER EINER AMINOSÄURE UND EINEN UV-FILTER ENTHÄLT | [2004/32] | English: | COMPOSITION CONTAINING AN AMINO ACID N-ACYLATED ESTER AND A POLYAMIDE-STRUCTURED UV FILTER | [2004/32] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT UN ESTER N-ACYLE D'ACIDE AMINE ET UN FILTRE UV STRUCTUREE PAR UN POLYAMIDE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 16.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2008 | CY | 02.01.2008 | CZ | 02.01.2008 | DK | 02.01.2008 | EE | 02.01.2008 | FI | 02.01.2008 | IE | 02.01.2008 | NL | 02.01.2008 | SK | 02.01.2008 | TR | 02.01.2008 | BG | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.04.2008 | PT | 02.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
TR | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CY | 02.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
EE | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
CZ | 02.01.2008 | ||
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
SK | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
IE | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
DK | 02.01.2008 | ||
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
PT | 02.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 02.01.2008 | |
FI | 02.01.2008 | ||
NL | 02.01.2008 | ||
BG | 02.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 02.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0928608 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [AD] 1-20* the whole document *; | [AD]EP1068856 (OREAL [FR]) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO0197758 (COSMOLAB INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,5-19 * the whole document * |