EP1457060 - COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marconi UK Intellectual Property Ltd New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Marconi UK Intellectual Property Ltd New Century Park P.O. Box 53 Coventry, CV3 1HJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADDERN, Thomas Slade "Pednvounder" 113 Middlehill Road, Colehill Wimborne, Dorset BH21 2HL / GB | 02 /
PROCTOR, Richard John 28 Diprose Road, Corfe Mullen Wimborne, Dorset BH21 3QY / GB | 03 /
CHOPPING, Geoffrey "Tregarth", Furzehill Wimborne, Dorset BH21 4HD / GB | 04 /
BRANFIELD, Henry, Anthony Wellside Cottage, 3 St. Mary's Close, Lee Common Great Missenden, Buck HP16 9JU / GB | 05 /
SCOTT, David, Ian 10 Debden Close, Dorridge Solihull, West Midlands B93 8RL / GB | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz Marconi Intellectual Property New Century Park Post Point 51 Coventry West Midlands CV3 1HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Stasiewski, Piotr Grzegorz Marconi Intellectual Property New Century Park Post Point 51 Coventry, West Midlands CV3 1HJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Cardus, Alan Peter, et al Marconi Intellectual Property, Crompton Close Basildon, Essex SS14 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02788119.2 | 16.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002GB05703 | Priority number, date | GB20010030729 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0130729 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03056846 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457060 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457060 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0016 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5619 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5632 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13076 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13332 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13342 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1338 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSNETWERK | [2004/38] | English: | COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2004/38] | French: | RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 11.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.09.2005 | BE | 14.09.2005 | CH | 14.09.2005 | CZ | 14.09.2005 | EE | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | FR | 14.09.2005 | LI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | SI | 14.09.2005 | SK | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | BG | 14.12.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | CY | 16.12.2005 | IE | 16.12.2005 | ES | 25.12.2005 | LU | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
EE | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CY | 16.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
FR | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
EE | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
CY | 16.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
EE | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
ES | 25.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
IE | 16.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 14.09.2005 | |
BE | 14.09.2005 | ||
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SK | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CH | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
LI | 14.09.2005 | ||
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SI | 14.09.2005 | ||
BG | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | Cited in | International search | [DX]GB2334407 (PLESSEY TELECOMM [GB], et al) [DX] 1-7 * page 3, line 7 - line 24 * * page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 1 *; | [DX]GB2334408 (MARCONI COMM LTD [GB]) [DX] 1-7 * page 3, line 19 - line 23 ** page 17, line 18 - line 23 * |