EP1472865 - DISTRIBUTION OF ENCRYPTED INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Irdeto B.V. 105 Taurus Avenue 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2013/36] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states Irdeto Eindhoven B.V. Jupiterstraat 42 2132 HD Hoofddorp / NL | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIJCKAERT, Albert, M., A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN RIJNSOEVER, Bartholomeus, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/43] | Tucker, Nigel P., et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/09] | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2009/40] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/40] | de Vries, Johannes Hendrik Fokke, et al de Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2004/45] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02788317.2 | 09.12.2002 | [2004/45] | WO2002IB05272 | Priority number, date | EP20020075144 | 14.01.2002 Original published format: EP 02075144 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03058956 | Date: | 17.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472865 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/913, H04N7/16 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N21/6334 (KR);
H04N21/4623 (KR);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91364 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTEILUNG VERSCHLÜSSELTER INFORMATION | [2004/45] | English: | DISTRIBUTION OF ENCRYPTED INFORMATION | [2004/45] | French: | DISTRIBUTION DE DONNEES CHIFFREES | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/11] | 28.12.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/11] | Appeal following examination | 20.02.2012 | Appeal received No. T1167/12 | 25.04.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.12.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9827732 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [DA] 1,7,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]US6222924 (SALOMAEKI ARI [FI]) [A] 1,7,9,10 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 6 * | Examination | US6005938 | WO0176246 | EP1109405 | WO0145387 | - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 |