EP1562957 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 3-PROPENYL CEPHALOSPORIN DMF SOLVATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orchid Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd Orchid Towers, 313 Valluvar Kottam High Road, Nungambakkam 600 034 Chennai Tamilnadu / IN | [2006/37] |
Former [2005/33] | For all designated states Orchid Chemicals and Pharmaceuticals Ltd Orchid Towers, 313 Valluvar Kottam High Road, Nungambakkam 600 034 Chennai, Tamilnadu / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESHPANDE, Pandurang Balwant 476 14 R&D Centre, Old Mahabalipuram Road Sholinganallur, Chennai-600 119 / IN | 02 /
KHADANGALE, Bhausaheb Pandharinath 476 14 R&D Centre, Old Mahabalipuram Road Sholinganallur, Chennai-600 119 / IN | 03 /
GURUSAMY, Kumar 476 14 R&D Centre, Old Mahabalipuram Road Sholinganallur, Chennai-600 119 / IN | 04 /
KONDA, Ramesh Athmaram 476 14 R&D Centre, Old Mahabalipuram Road Sholinganallur, Chennai-600 119 / IN | [2006/33] |
Former [2005/33] | 01 /
DESHPANDE, Pandurang Balwant F-3, Sand Stone Apartment, First Avenue Indira Nagar, 600 020 Chennai / IN | ||
02 /
KHADANGALE, Bhausaheb Pandharinath Santhi Avenue, No.7, Dr. Radhakrishnan Road Thiruvanmiyur 600 041 Chennai / IN | |||
03 /
GURUSAMY, Kumar Plot NO.33, V.O.C. Nagar Mahalaxmi Nagar Selaiyur 600 073 Chennai / IN | |||
04 /
KONDA, Ramesh Athmaram New No.5, Ashtabujam First Lane Choolai 600 112 Chennai / IN | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Bremi, Tobias, Dr., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 02788375.0 | 18.12.2002 | [2005/33] | WO2002IB05459 | Priority number, date | INMA08002002 | 30.10.2002 Original published format: IN MA08002002 | [2005/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004039812 | Date: | 13.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1562957 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1562957 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/04 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
C07D501/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/08] |
Former [2005/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3-PROPENYLCEPHALOSPORIN DMF SOLVAT | [2005/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 3-PROPENYL CEPHALOSPORIN DMF SOLVATE | [2005/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SOLVATE DE 3-PROPENYLCEPHALOSPORINE DMF | [2005/33] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 12.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/39] | IT | 13.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4694079 (CRAST JR LEONARD B [US]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5869648 (LUDESCHER JOHANNES [AT], et al) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4112087 (BEEBY PHILIP J) [A] 11,12 * column 26, lines 57-59 * |