EP1560698 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR ASSEMBLING TYRES FOR VEHICLE WHEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 25 IT-20126 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Pirelli Tyre S.p.A. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states PIRELLI PNEUMATICI Società per Azioni Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LACAGNINA, Claudio Via dell'Acqua, 18/2 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | [2005/32] | Representative(s) | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio Bugnion S.p.A. Via A. Gramsci, 42 50132 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/32] | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio C/O Bugnion S.p.A., Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02788551.6 | 05.11.2002 | [2005/32] | WO2002IT00699 | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004041521 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1560698 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1560698 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/60, B29D30/20 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B29D30/20 (EP,KR,US);
B29D30/60 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/02] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFBAUEN EINES FAHRZEUGREIFENS | [2005/32] | English: | A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR ASSEMBLING TYRES FOR VEHICLE WHEELS | [2005/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REALISATION D'UN PNEUMATIQUE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2004 | Translation filed | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 25.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2007 | 01.08.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | CZ | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | EE | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | SK | 09.01.2008 | BG | 09.04.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | ES | 20.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/34] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
EE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
SK | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
BG | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3775220 (RATTRAY W) [A] 1,3-5,12-14* column 1, line 9 - line 45 *; | [A]WO9858794 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * page 10, line 9 - line 20; figures 3A,4 *; | [DA]WO0136185 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [DA] 1,5-8,12,15,16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1211057 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,11-15 * column 3, line 15 - line 26 * * column 6, line 38 - line 44; figure 2 * * column 7, line 22 - line 36; figure 4 * * column 9, line 28 - line 32; figure 7 *; | [X]US2002153083 (TAKAGI SHIGEMASA [JP]) [X] 1-4,12,13 * paragraph [0057] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0119] , [0127] , [0128] *; | [E]WO02094545 (MARANGONI MECCANICA [IT], et al) [E] 1-4,12,13 * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 18; figures 1,2 * * page 10, line 12 - line 27; figure 4 * * page 11, line 5 - line 21; figure 11 * |