EP1462541 - METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM, SUBSTRATE HAVING TRANSPARENT ELECTROCONDUCTIVE FILM AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE USING THE SUBSTRATE | ||
[2014/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJISAWA, Akira c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
SUEYOSHI, Yukio c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 03 /
HIRATA, Masahiro c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Toru c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 05 /
KIYOHARA, Koichiro c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 06 /
ICHIKI, Kiyotaka c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2015/10] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
FUJISAWA, Akira 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | ||
02 /
SUEYOSHI, Yukio 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | |||
03 /
HIRATA, Masahiro 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | |||
04 /
YAMAMOTO, Toru 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | |||
05 /
KIYOHARA, Koichiro 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | |||
06 /
ICHIKI, Kiyotaka 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2004/40] | Thomson, James B. Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02788704.1 | 03.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002JP12620 | Priority number, date | JP20010368352 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001368352 | JP20010368662 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001368662 | JP20020293095 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002293095 | JP20020293096 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002293096 | [2004/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048411 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462541 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462541 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/40, H01L31/04, C03C17/245, C03C17/34, C23C16/02, C23C16/54, H01L31/18 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
C23C16/407 (EP,US);
C03C17/245 (EP,US);
C03C17/3417 (EP,US);
C03C17/3452 (EP,US);
C23C16/0272 (EP,US);
C23C16/0281 (EP,US);
C23C16/545 (EP,US);
H01L31/1884 (EP,US);
C03C2217/211 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | C23C16/40, H01L31/04 | Designated contracting states | GB [2015/10] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON DÜNNFILM. | [2014/46] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM. | [2014/46] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FORMER UN FILM MINCE. | [2014/46] |
Former [2004/40] | VERFAHREN ZUR BILDUNG VON DÜNNFILM, SUBSTRAT MIT TRANSPARENTEM ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEM FILM UND PHOTOELEKTRISCHE UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM SUBSTRAT | ||
Former [2004/40] | METHOD FOR FORMING THIN FILM, SUBSTRATE HAVING TRANSPARENT ELECTROCONDUCTIVE FILM AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE USING THE SUBSTRATE | ||
Former [2004/40] | PROCEDE POUR FORMER UN FILM MINCE, SUBSTRAT COMPRENANT UN FILM ELECTRO-CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOELECTRIQUE UTILISANT LE SUBSTRAT | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | Translation filed | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 16.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5487784 (ELLIS JR FRANK B [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8,11; | [Y]EP0755902 (PILKINGTON PLC [GB]) [Y] 4,8 * example 25 *; | [Y]EP1054454 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 10,11,13 * claims 1-4; tables 1,3 *; | [XY]EP1057796 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 9,12,14 * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * [Y] 10,11,13; | [A]EP1143501 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH03180462 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2001035262 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001048593 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001039738 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [A]JPH11180734 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) | Examination | JPH05274917 |