EP1462704 - ROTARY JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitta Corporation 4-26, Sakuragawa 4-chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 556-0022 / JP | [2007/20] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Nitta Corporation 4-26, Sakuragawa 4-chome, Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATSUTA, Takashi, Nitta Corporation Nara Plant 172, Ikezawa-cho Yamatokohriyama-shi, Nara 639-1032 / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 02788823.9 | 13.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002JP13066 | Priority number, date | JP20010380109 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001380109 | [2004/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03054433 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462704 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462704 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/08, F16L39/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
F16L27/0824 (EP,US);
F16K25/02 (KR);
F16K27/00 (KR);
F16L27/08 (KR);
Y10T403/32975 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | F16L27/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | DREHGELENK | [2004/40] | English: | ROTARY JOINT | [2004/40] | French: | JOINT ROTATIF | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2004 | Translation filed | 02.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.05.2007 | BE | 16.05.2007 | CH | 16.05.2007 | CY | 16.05.2007 | DK | 16.05.2007 | EE | 16.05.2007 | FI | 16.05.2007 | LI | 16.05.2007 | NL | 16.05.2007 | SI | 16.05.2007 | BG | 16.08.2007 | GR | 17.08.2007 | PT | 16.10.2007 | IE | 13.12.2007 | LU | 13.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/34] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
CY | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 13.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 13.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
IE | 13.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
BE | 16.05.2007 | ||
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 16.05.2007 | |
CH | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 16.05.2007 | |
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
LI | 16.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4858962 (BOELLING FRITZ C [DE], et al) [X] 1* column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 62; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JPS61622Y ; | [A]JP2000135568 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) |