03.09.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
11.05.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2009 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2007 |
First examination report |
|
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
05.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|