Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007161646 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49519604 | 11.05.2004 | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | US68725707 | 16.03.2007 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7192973 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2007 | B2 | US2004267016 | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4459622B | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | B2 | JP2005510522 | 21.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002353691B | Global Dossier | 03.04.2008 | B2 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1448548 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0214140 | 19.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2464347 | 22.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0402261 | 28.07.2009 | A3 | HUP0402261 | 28.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL161699 | 31.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL196059 | 29.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS7256 | 10.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04004503 | 11.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO327221B | 18.05.2009 | B1 | NO20042157L | 11.08.2004 | L | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ532411 | 25.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA77969 | 15.02.2007 | C2 | Priority number | Date | SE0202055 | 12.11.2002 | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03042205 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050044470 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR037351 | 03.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100398535C | 02.07.2008 | C | CN1585763 | 23.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY137144 | 31.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL369758 | 02.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2345990 | 10.02.2009 | C2 | RU2004111601 | 20.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE0103818D0 | 15.11.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200407139 | 16.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200403688 | 10.08.2005 | B | Priority number | Date | SE0103818 | 15.11.2001 |