04.06.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
26.06.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
19.06.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.06.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.02.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
05.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.05.2007 |
First examination report |
|
28.04.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|