EP1451945 - EIRP STATISTICAL CALCULATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLAIN, Christopher J. 4102 Linden Avenue North, Apt. 201 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 02 /
PALMER, John, R. 3842 NE 89th Street Seattle, WA 98115 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2004/36] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 02789669.5 | 12.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US36677 | Priority number, date | US20010004959 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: US 4959 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049324 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451945 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451945 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H01Q1/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/18506 (EP);
H04N7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/31] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STATISTISCHEN EIRP-BERECHNUNG | [2004/36] | English: | EIRP STATISTICAL CALCULATION METHOD | [2004/36] | French: | PROCEDE DE CALCUL STATISTIQUE DE LA PUISSANCE ISOTROPE RAYONNEE EQUIVALENTE (EIRP) | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 03.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0805568 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1,12,19 * column 3, line 1 - line 24 * * column 6, line 35 - column 8, line 5 *; | [A] - HUGHES R O, "MONTE CARLO ANALYSIS OF SATELLITE BEAM POINTING ERRORS", JOURNAL OF GUIDANCE AND CONTROL AND DYNAMICS, AIAA. NEW YORK, US, (1992), vol. 15, no. 1, ISSN 0731-5090, pages 35 - 39, XP000248303 [A] 1,12,19 * page 35, column L, line 1 - line 4 * * page 38, column L, line 1 - column R, line 19 * |