EP1485797 - BOOT PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Intel Corporation (a Delaware Corporation) 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DATTA, Samanna 532 NE Lenox Street Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US | 02 /
BRANNOCK, Kirk 18623 SW Forest Park Rd. Hillsboro, OR 97123 / US | 03 /
ZIMMER, Vincent 1937 South 369th Street Federal Way, WA 98003 / US | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | ||
Former [2004/51] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 02790148.7 | 17.12.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002US40516 | Priority number, date | US20010032141 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: US 32141 | [2004/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03054697 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1485797 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485797 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
G06F9/4401 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHFAHRUNGSPROZESS | [2004/51] | English: | BOOT PROCESS | [2004/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE LANCEMENT | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2007 | BE | 07.11.2007 | CH | 07.11.2007 | CY | 07.11.2007 | CZ | 07.11.2007 | DK | 07.11.2007 | EE | 07.11.2007 | FI | 07.11.2007 | LI | 07.11.2007 | SI | 07.11.2007 | SK | 07.11.2007 | TR | 07.11.2007 | IE | 17.12.2007 | LU | 17.12.2007 | IT | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | BG | 07.02.2008 | SE | 07.02.2008 | GR | 08.02.2008 | ES | 18.02.2008 | PT | 07.04.2008 | [2011/12] |
Former [2009/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
TR | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
LU | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
LU | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CY | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
FI | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
EE | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
GR | 08.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
IE | 17.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
PT | 07.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
BE | 07.11.2007 | ||
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SK | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2007 | ||
DK | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 07.11.2007 | |
CH | 07.11.2007 | ||
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
SI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 07.11.2007 | |
LI | 07.11.2007 | ||
BG | 07.02.2008 | ||
SE | 07.02.2008 | ||
ES | 18.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6081890 (DATTA SHAM [US]) [A] 1-27 * column 1 - column 6; figure 2 *; | [A]US6202091 (GODSE DHANANJAY [CA]) [A] 1-27 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 39 *; | [A] - INTEL, Extensible Firmware Interface Specification Version 1.02 (pages 319-326), (20001212), XP002271556 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * | [A] - DAVID GRAWROCK, Building Trust and Privacy into Open PC Systems, INTEL, (200011), XP002271557 [A] 9,10,26,27 * the whole document * | [A] - MICHAEL KINNEY, Solving BIOS Boot issues with EFI, INTEL, (200009), XP002271558 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |