26.05.2023 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2023 [2023/26] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
21.05.2010 |
Change - designated states |
published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
17.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
07.12.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
16.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
12.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
29.12.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |
20.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.11.2006 |
Change - designated states |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.10.2006 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
02.06.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.04.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
14.04.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
22.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2005 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
20.08.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
10.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|