Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7184064 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2007 | B2 | US2004125088 | 01.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US73693803 | 16.12.2003 | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100971452B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2010 | B1 | KR20040071767 | 12.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4981243B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2012 | B2 | JP2005515530 | 26.05.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3379400 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2022 | B1 | EP3379400 | 26.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13184227 | 13.12.2002 | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | EP02790580 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2767892 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2015 | A3 | EP2767892 | 20.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | EP02790580 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2698699 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2018 | B1 | EP2698699 | 30.07.2014 | A3 | EP2698699 | 19.02.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | EP02790580 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2698698 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | B1 | EP2698698 | 30.07.2014 | A3 | EP2698698 | 19.02.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | EP02790580 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002367041 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2003 | A8 | AU2002367041 | 30.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1459165 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B1 | EP1459165 | 22.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102270098B | 15.07.2015 | B | CN102270098 | 07.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | CN02826403 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103761049B | 29.12.2017 | B | CN103761049 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | CN02826403 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104598149B | 26.01.2018 | B | CN104598149 | 06.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | CN02826403 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1695105B | 24.12.2014 | B | CN1695105 | 09.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1117782T | 17.05.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1459165T | 18.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2578253T | 22.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1459165T | 31.08.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | IB0205422 | 13.12.2002 | EP02790580 | 13.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03060622 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2003 | A3 | WO03060622 | 24.07.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6329886B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2018 | B2 | JP2015092358 | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5945264B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014089729 | 15.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5826623B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2015 | B2 | JP2012079339 | 19.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5356849B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2013 | B2 | JP2009104649 | 14.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101866268B | 06.02.2013 | B | CN101866268 | 20.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2676186T | 17.07.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1459165E | 20.06.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6690387 | 10.02.2004 | B2 | US2003122787 | 03.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US3437501 | 28.12.2001 | Type | Divisional application | EP2698698 | EP2698699 | EP2767892 | EP3379400 |