EP1459165 - TOUCH-SCREEN IMAGE SCROLLING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMERMAN, John, Z. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MARTINO, Jacquelyn, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2016/15] |
Former [2004/39] | 01 /
ZIMMERMAN, John, Z. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
MARTINO, Jacquelyn, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/39] | Uittenbogaard, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02790580.1 | 13.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002IB05422 | Priority number, date | US20010034375 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: US 34375 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03060622 | Date: | 24.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1459165 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1459165 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0488 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2004/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHUNGSEMPFINDLICHE ANZEIGEEINHEIT, BILDVERSCHIEBUNGSYSTEM UND- VERFAHREN | [2004/39] | English: | TOUCH-SCREEN IMAGE SCROLLING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2004/39] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DEROULEMENT D'IMAGE SUR UN ECRAN TACTILE | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.08.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 26.08.2013 | Appeal received No. T0077/14 | 11.12.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.03.2014 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2014/11] | 19.03.2014 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2014/12] | 30.06.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 30.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.07.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP13184226.2 / EP2698698 | EP13184227.0 / EP2698699 | EP14166393.0 / EP2767892 | EP18167509.1 / EP3379400 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4954967 (TAKAHASHI HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 44 - line 51; figures 6A,7 * * column 3, line 3 - line 64; claims 1,4,5,8,15 *; | [Y]WO9957630 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 5, line 23 - line 31 * * page 7, line 14 - line 20 ** page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 2; claims 1,2,6,811 * | Examination | EP0707258 | EP0938040 | EP0880091 | US5880411 | WO0133540 | - ANONYMOUS, "ISO 9241-10:1996 Ergonomic requirements for office work with visual display terminals (VDTs). Part 10: Dialogue principles", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD, ISO, ZUERICH, CH, (19960501), vol. 9241-10:1996, pages 1 - 11, XP001525044 | - ANONYMOUS, "ISO 9241-16. Ergonomic requirements for office work with visual display terminals (VDTs) - Part 16: Direct manipulation dialogues = EXIGENCES ERGONOMIQUES POUR TRAVAIL DE BUREAU AVEC TERMINAUX A ECRANS DE VISUALISATION (TEV) - PARTIE 16: DIALOGUES DE TYPE MANIPULATION DIRECTE", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD, ISO, ZUERICH, CH, (19990901), vol. 9241-16, page 38PP, XP001525166 | - ANONYMOUS, "ISO 9241-11:1998 Ergonomic requirements for office work with visual display terminals (VDTs) -- Part 11: Guidance on usability", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD, ISO, ZUERICH, CH, (19980101), vol. 9241-11, page 22PP, XP001525162 |