EP1573262 - HEAT EXCHANGER OF VENTILATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Soo-Yeon; Booyoung Apt. 1202-902 Wolsanmaeul; Boogok-Li, Jangyu-Myeon 621-833 Gimhae Kyungsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Seong-Hwan Wooseong Apt. 102-1303, Namyang-Dong 641-091 Changwon Kyungsangnam-Do / KR | 03 /
CHO, Min-Chul 812-8, 2/3, Mandeok 1-Dong, Buk-Ku 616-830 Busan / KR | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street GB-London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02791010.8 | 02.12.2002 | [2005/37] | WO2002KR02263 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004051170 | Date: | 17.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573262 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573262 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/04, F28D9/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
F24F12/006 (EP,US);
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28D9/0062 (EP,US);
F28F3/025 (EP,US);
F28F3/04 (EP,US);
F28F3/044 (EP,US);
Y02B30/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER EINER LÜFTUNGSANLAGE | [2005/37] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER OF VENTILATING SYSTEM | [2005/37] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR D'UN SYSTEME DE VENTILATION | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | PT | 26.08.2008 | IE | 02.12.2008 | LU | 02.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 02.12.2008 | ||
LU | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 02.12.2008 | ||
LU | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
IE | 02.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
PT | 26.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1336448 (CENTRE SCIENT TECH BATIMENT); | [Y]JPS62225894 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP); | [X]US2002005280 (WITTIG HORST [DE], et al) |