EP1454180 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EMBEDDING CHARACTERS IN A BAR OF A BAR CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Barcode Corporation 1180 Avenue of the Americas, 14th Floor New York, NY 10036 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states International Barcode Corporation 1180 Avenue of the Americas, 14th Floor New York, NY 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUBOW, Allen 692 10th Street Brooklyn, NY 11215-4502 / US | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2004/37] | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02791236.9 | 12.11.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002US36371 | Priority number, date | US20010347561P | 09.11.2001 Original published format: US 347561 P | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040804 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1454180 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454180 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10, G06K7/10, G06K9/22, G06K19/06, G06K19/08 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
G06K19/06 (EP,US);
G06K19/06028 (EP,US);
G06K19/083 (EP,US);
G06K19/14 (EP,US);
G06K19/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | G02B26/10, G06K7/10, G06K9/22, G06K19/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBETTEN VON ZEICHEN IN EINEN STRICH EINES STRICHCODES | [2004/37] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EMBEDDING CHARACTERS IN A BAR OF A BAR CODE | [2004/37] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE DES CARACTERES DANS UNE BARRE DE CODE A BARRES | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | IE | 12.11.2007 | LU | 12.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
IE | 12.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4889367 (MILLER L MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * column 2, line 45 - line 61; figures 2,3,6A-6C ** column 5, line 3 - line 10 * | International search | [A]US4777357 (HARADA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [A]US4795281 (ULINSKI SR RICHARD J [US], et al); | [X]US5563401 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]); | [A]JPH09231338 (NITSUKO LTD); | [X]US6032861 (LEMELSON JEROME H [US], et al) |