EP1448968 - PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Rainer Burgunder Strasse 17 79588 Efringen-Kirchen / DE | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Andres, Angelika Maria, et al Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Andres, Angelika Endress + Hauser (Deutschland) Holding GmbH, PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 02791682.4 | 15.11.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002EP12801 | Priority number, date | DE20011057761 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10157761 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03046499 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448968 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448968 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/06 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G01L13/025 (EP,US);
G01L19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKAUFNEHMER | [2004/35] | English: | PRESSURE SENSOR | [2004/35] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 04.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.01.2008 | CZ | 23.01.2008 | DK | 23.01.2008 | EE | 23.01.2008 | FI | 23.01.2008 | IE | 23.01.2008 | NL | 23.01.2008 | SK | 23.01.2008 | TR | 23.01.2008 | BG | 23.04.2008 | SE | 23.04.2008 | GR | 24.04.2008 | ES | 04.05.2008 | PT | 23.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
TR | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 23.01.2008 | |
CZ | 23.01.2008 | ||
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
EE | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 23.01.2008 | |
DK | 23.01.2008 | ||
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
SK | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
IE | 23.01.2008 | ||
NL | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | DK | 23.01.2008 | |
FI | 23.01.2008 | ||
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
SE | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
PT | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 23.01.2008 | |
BG | 23.04.2008 | ||
ES | 04.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 04.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8903521 (MCDANIEL PATRICK K [US]) [A] 1-9 * page 7, line 3 - page 10, line 35 ** page 17, line 28 - page 18, line 29 *; | [A]US5054756 (RIEMSCHEID HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 62 - column 10, line 30 *; | [A]EP0565271 (PALL CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 56 * * column 7, line 16 - column 9, line 14 * |