12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
27.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
16.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
24.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
13.04.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
09.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] |
15.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
24.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
27.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2006 [2006/48] |
05.05.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
13.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.04.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.12.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.11.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2005 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
15.02.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
15.02.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
23.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
20.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|