EP1472383 - PRECIPITATION HARDENABLE AUSTENITIC STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Sandvik Intellectual Property HB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Sandvik AB 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZETTERHOLM, Gustaf Köpmangatan 22C S-811-39 Sandviken / SE | 02 /
HOLMBERG, Hakan Tibastvägen 6 S-802 69 Gävle / SE | [2004/52] |
Former [2004/45] | 01 /
ZETTERHOLM, Gustaf Smala vägen 3b S-811 32 Sandviken / SE | ||
02 /
HOLMBERG, Hakan Tibastvägen 6 S-802 69 Gävle / SE | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel Sandvik AB Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Taquist, Lennart Sandvik AB, Intellectual Property 811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 02792137.8 | 11.12.2002 | [2004/45] | WO2002SE02300 | Priority number, date | SE20010004192 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: SE 0104192 | [2004/45] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03056053 | Date: | 10.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1472383 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1472383 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/42 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/40 (KR);
C21D8/0236 (EP,US);
C21D9/52 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSSCHEIDUNGSHÄRTBARER AUSTENITISCHER STAHL | [2004/45] | English: | PRECIPITATION HARDENABLE AUSTENITIC STEEL | [2004/45] | French: | ACIER AUSTENITIQUE DURCISSABLE PAR PRECIPITATION | [2004/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2003 | Translation filed | 16.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 15.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | CH | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | FR | 18.04.2007 | LI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | SI | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | GB | 11.12.2007 | IE | 11.12.2007 | LU | 11.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
GB | 11.12.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
GB | 11.12.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
GB | 11.12.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
FR | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 11.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
FR | 14.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CH | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
LI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 18.04.2007 | |
ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2001081535 ; | [X]US3910788 (FUJIOKA TOKIO, et al); | [X]EP0735154 (NIPPON YAKIN KOGYO CO LTD [JP]); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 33, Database accession no. 2001-314036, XP002978873 & JP2001081535 A 20010327 (NISSHIN STEEL CO. LTD.) |