|
26.05.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2008 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.04.2008 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.12.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.08.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2006 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2005 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2004 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2004 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2004 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2004 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.05.2004 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
19.04.2004 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.11.2003 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2003 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |