07.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] |
29.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] |
13.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] |
23.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
30.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
16.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] |
21.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
22.05.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
10.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
06.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
13.06.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
12.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.06.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.05.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
17.01.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
02.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.02.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
10.02.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
30.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
20.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2004 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
28.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|