Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002357733 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0236799 | 14.11.2002 | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1456987 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2008 | B1 | EP1456987 | 29.03.2006 | A4 | EP1456987 | 15.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0236799 | 14.11.2002 | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2468764 | 08.02.2011 | C | CA2468764 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0236799 | 14.11.2002 | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60227698D1 | 28.08.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0236799 | 14.11.2002 | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04005111 | 29.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0236799 | 14.11.2002 | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03049343 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE401708T | 15.08.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7352715 | 01.04.2008 | B2 | US2003103486 | 05.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28044802 | 25.10.2002 | US33736601 | 30.11.2001 |