EP1456987 - TIME SYNCHRONIZATION USING DYNAMIC THRESHOLDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellnet Innovations, Inc. 30000 Mill Creek Avenue, Suite 100-Patents, 100 Milton Park Alpharetta Georgia 30022 / US | [2008/25] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Schlumbergersema Inc. 100 Milton Parc, 30000 Mill Creek Avenue, Suite 100 Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALT, Metin 134 Kia Drive Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 02 /
RAGLE, Stephen, J. 470 Carrwick Circle Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | 03 /
BENGTSSON, Johan 751 Laurel Street, No. 110 San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
PAIK, Ellen 1103 Cresthaven Drive Silver Springs, MD 20903 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02792271.5 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002US36799 | Priority number, date | US20010337366P | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 337366 P | US20020280448 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: US 280448 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03049343 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456987 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1456987 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, G06F1/14, H04B7/26 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H04J3/0667 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/38] | H04J3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/29] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 18.06.2004 | LT | 18.06.2004 | LV | 18.06.2004 | MK | 18.06.2004 | RO | 18.06.2004 | SI | 18.06.2004 | Title | German: | ZEITSYNCHRONISATION MIT DYNAMISCHEN SCHWELLEN | [2004/38] | English: | TIME SYNCHRONIZATION USING DYNAMIC THRESHOLDS | [2004/38] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION TEMPORELLE AU MOYEN DE SEUILS DYNAMIQUES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 04.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | BE | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IT | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | ES | 27.10.2008 | IE | 14.11.2008 | LU | 14.11.2008 | CH | 30.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | LI | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/48] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CY | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
GR | 17.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CY | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CY | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
LU | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
CH | 30.11.2008 | ||
LI | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
IE | 14.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IT | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
BE | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 16.07.2008 | |
ES | 27.10.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5276659 (KOTAKI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 30 * * column 3, line 8 - line 19 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 10 *; | [Y]US5535217 (CHEUNG YIU M [CA], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - line 52 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 48 *; | [A]US5689688 (STRONG HOVEY RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 7 - line 27 * * column 4, line 52 - line 65 * * column 6, line 34 - line 46 * * column 10, line 25 - line 62 *; | [A]US2001022823 (RENAUD PIERRE [CA]) [A] 1-21 * abstract ** paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * | International search | [A]US5784421 (DOLEV DANNY [IL], et al); | [A]US6069887 (GEIGER EDWARD W [US], et al); | [XP]US6351821 (VOTH DUANE J [US]); | [AP]US6370161 (EHRLICH JASON K [US], et al) |