EP1461466 - NANO-COMPSITE MARTENSITIC STEELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MMFX Technologies Corporation 2415 Campus Drive, Suite 100 Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2008/28] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states MMFX Technologies Corporation 2 Corporate Park, Suite 102 Irvine, CA 92606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUSINSKI, Grzegorz, J. 2119 Carleton St., Apt. D Berkeley, CA 94704 / US | 02 /
POLLACK, David 1901 Jan Marie Place Tustin, CA 92780 / US | 03 /
THOMAS, Gareth 1104 Princeton Drive, Sonoma Greens Sonoma, CA 95476 / US | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Setna, Rohan P., et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02792396.0 | 12.12.2002 | [2004/40] | WO2002US40063 | Priority number, date | US20010017879 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: US 17879 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03052152 | Date: | 26.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1461466 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1461466 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/18, C22C38/40, C22C38/58, C21D1/19, C21D8/02 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
C22C38/40 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/00 (NO);
C22C38/18 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2201/03 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/008 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | C22C38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MARTENSITISCHE NANOVERBUNDSTÄHLE | [2004/40] | English: | NANO-COMPSITE MARTENSITIC STEELS | [2004/40] | French: | ACIERS MARTENSITIQUES NANO-COMPOSITES | [2004/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 02.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 31.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.07.2008 | CY | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | GB | 12.12.2008 | IE | 12.12.2008 | LU | 12.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
LU | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
GB | 12.12.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IE | 12.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4619714 (THOMAS GARETH [US], et al) [AD] 1-10 * column 4, lines 17-68; claims 1-4 *; | [XD]US4671827 (THOMAS GARETH [US], et al) [XD] 1-10 * column 4, line 11 - column 5, line 10 *; | [A]US6159312 (KOO JAYOUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1-26 *; | [XD]US6273968 (THOMAS GARETH [US]) [XD] 1-10 * column 5, lines 6-35 *; | [A] - THOMAS, G. (UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA (BERKELEY)) ET AL, "Lath ( packet ) martensite revisited .", HEAT TREATING: INCLUDING STEEL HEAT TREATING IN THE NEW MILLENIUM , 515-518, GRAPHS, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, 11 REF. ASM INTERNATIONAL. MEMBER/CUSTOMER SERVICE CENTER, MATERIALS PARK, OH 44073-0002, USA CONFERENCE: 19TH ASM HEAT TREATING SOCIETY CONFERENC, (2000), XP009046448 [A] 1-10 * page 515 * | [A] - YAO, C.K. ET AL, "Influence of Hot-Deformation on Morphology and Effective Grain Size of Lath Martensite in 18Ni Maraging Steel.", MATER. CHEM. PHYS. (JUNE 1986) 14, (6), 559-568 ISSN: 0254-0584, (1986), XP001205692 [A] 1-10 * page 565 - page 567 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0254-0584(86)90099-4 | International search | [Y]US5180450 (RAO BANAGARU V N [US]); | [Y]US6273968 (THOMAS GARETH [US]) |