EP1458491 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING WIRE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoffmann, Hans Glaserstrasse 18 5026 Salzburg / AT | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstrasse 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Flosdorff, Jürgen, Dr. Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792571.8 | 12.12.2002 | [2004/39] | WO2002AT00347 | Priority number, date | AT20010001994 | 20.12.2001 Original published format: AT 19942001 | [2004/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03053594 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458491 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458491 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/06, B65H71/00, B23K9/133 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
B65H71/00 (EP,US);
B23K26/211 (EP,US);
B23K9/124 (EP,US);
B23K9/133 (EP,US);
B23K9/235 (EP,US);
B23K9/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON DRAHTMATERIAL | [2004/39] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TREATING WIRE MATERIAL | [2004/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR TRAITER UN MATERIAU SOUS FORME DE FIL | [2004/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/39] | 31.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | FR | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | IT | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 12.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 12.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
FR | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2357079 (BROWN ODELL T) [A] 1,22 * column W *; | [A]US3034477 (WILLIAMS HARRY D) [A] 1,22 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3877414 (BRIDEAU FRANCIS N, et al) [A] 1,22 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 5 *; | [A]US4601918 (ZAMAN MOHAMMAD F [US], et al) [A] 1,22 * column A *; | [A]FR2703036 (FILOTEX SA [FR]) [A] 1,22* column W * | by applicant | US2819314 | DE2045800 | AT405799B | - "Neue Erkennitsse beim MAGN-Hochleistungsschweiß mit rotierendem Lichtbogen", SCHWEIß- UND PROFTECHNIK, (199703), pages 34 - 41 |