EP1455983 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND EVALUATING PROCESS DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLER, Frank Kolbergstrasse 6 30175 Hannover / DE | 02 /
HOLWEG, Jörg Gardeleger Strasse 2 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
MÜLLER, Frank Kolbergstrasse 6 30175 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
HOLWEG, Jörg Halbehof 9 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schippan, Ralph, et al Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Schippan, Ralph, Dr.-Ing., et al COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792792.0 | 22.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002EP13130 | Priority number, date | DE2001161087 | 12.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10161087 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03050478 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455983 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455983 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/25 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
B23K10/006 (EP);
B23K11/256 (EP);
G01D1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/28] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG UND AUSWERTUNG VON PROZESSDATEN | [2004/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING AND EVALUATING PROCESS DATA | [2004/38] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION ET D'EVALUATION DE DONNEES DE PROCESSUS | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.07.2008 | ES | 20.10.2008 | GB | 22.11.2008 | FR | 30.11.2008 | [2011/45] |
Former [2010/01] | IT | 09.07.2008 | |
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
GB | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | IT | 09.07.2008 | |
ES | 20.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | ES | 20.10.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0373422 (ELPATRONIC AG (CH)) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * the whole document * [A] 3,4,9; | [A]DE19743600 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG (DE)) [A] 1,8 * the whole document * | [XA] - THOEN JNULL ET AL, "STATISTICAL SOUND ANALYSIS: A VALUABLE APPROACH FOR ENVIRONMENTAL NOISE EVALUATION MONITORING IN ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL", JOURNAL A, SOFT VISION, BRUSSELS, BE, (19921001), vol. 33, no. 3, ISSN 0771-1107, pages 123 - 126, XP000322822 [X] 1,2,4,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 3,9 |