EP1455824 - LYOPHILIZED PREPARATION CONTAINING ANTIBODIES TO THE EGF RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/32] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHLER, Hanns-Christian Buschungstrasse 54a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
ZOBEL, Hans-Peter Bahnweg 5A 65439 Flörsheim / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Robert Rhönring 131 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
BACHMANN, Christiane Am Mattes 33 66773 Gladbach / DE | 05 /
HAAS, Udo Trinkbornstrasse 30 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 06 /
KRÜGER, Ludwig Ruhlandstrasse 75 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | 07 /
MARTINI-MARR, Ulrike Mühleweg 9 D- 79591 Eimeldingen / DE | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
MAHLER, Hanns-Christian Buschungstrasse 54a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
ZOBEL, Hans-Peter Bahnweg 5A 65439 Flörsheim / DE | |||
03 /
MÜLLER, Robert Rhönring 131 64289 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
BACHMANN, Christiane Am Mattes 33 66773 Gladbach / DE | |||
05 /
HAAS, Udo Trinkbornstrasse 30 64293 Darmstadt / DE | |||
06 /
KRÜGER, Ludwig Ruhlandstrasse 75 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | |||
07 /
MARTINI-MARR, Ulrike Im Schöffenstuhl 8 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02792797.9 | 25.11.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002EP13223 | Priority number, date | DE2001163459 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10163459 | [2004/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03053465 | Date: | 03.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455824 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455824 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K47/18, A61K47/26, A61K47/34, A61P35/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/18 (KR);
A61K47/183 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/32] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 06.05.2004 | LV | 06.05.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.05.2004 | SI | 06.05.2004 | Title | German: | LYOPHILISIERTE ZUBEREITUNG ENTHALTEND ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN DEN EGF-REZEPTOR | [2004/38] | English: | LYOPHILIZED PREPARATION CONTAINING ANTIBODIES TO THE EGF RECEPTOR | [2004/38] | French: | PREPARATION LYOPHILISEE RENFERMANT DES ANTICORPS LUTTANT CONTRE LE RECEPTEUR DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE EPIDERMIQUE EGF | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IE | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | AT | 25.11.2008 | LU | 25.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
TR | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
AT | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
AT | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
AT | 25.11.2008 | ||
LU | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
AT | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
AT | 25.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9822136 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [DY] 1-15 * page 10, line 21 - line 30; claim - * * page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [Y] - A.A. MORALES MORALES ET AL., "Freeze-dried formulation for direct 99mTc-labeling ior-egf/r3 MAb: Additives, biodistribution, and stability.", NUCLEAR MEDICINE & BIOLOGY, (199908), vol. 26, no. 6, pages 717 - 723, XP002252112 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-8051(99)00038-4 | [Y] - J. BASELGA, "The EGFR as a target for anticancer therapy-focus on cetuximab", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (200109), vol. 37, no. Suppl. 4, ISSN 0959-8049, pages S16 - S22, XP004307911 [Y] 1-15 * Seite S16, Zusammenfassung * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(01)00233-7 | [DY] - H. BIER ET AL., "Anti-(epidermal growth factor) receptor monoclonal antibodies for the induction of antibody-dependent cell-mediated cytotoxicity against squamous cell carcinoma lines of the head and neck.", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY IMMUNOTHERAPY, (199805), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 167 - 173, XP002252113 [DY] 1-15 * Seite 167, Zusammenfassung * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002620050475 | Examination | - LAI M.C.; TOPP E.M., "Solid-State Chemical Stability of Proteins and Peptides", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (199905), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 489 - 500 |