EP1456170 - AMINOACETONITRILE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR CONTROLLING PARASITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | [2009/43] |
Former [2004/38] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
LI
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUCRAY, Pierre 15A, rue de Huningue F-68300 Saint-Louis / FR | 02 /
GOEBEL, Thomas Lettenweg 28B 79539 Lörrach / DE | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis Animal Health, Inc. Patent and Trademark Group Werk Rosental 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis Animal Health, Inc. Patent and Trademark Group Werk Rosental 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/38] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02792909.0 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/38] | WO2002EP13811 | Priority number, date | CH20010002225 | 06.12.2001 Original published format: CH 222501 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048112 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1456170 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/29, A61K31/277, A61P33/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C07C255/42 (EP,KR,US);
A01N37/34 (KR);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P33/10 (EP);
A61P33/14 (EP);
C07C255/29 (KR);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOACETONITRIL-DERIVATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PARASITEN | [2004/38] | English: | AMINOACETONITRILE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE FOR CONTROLLING PARASITES | [2004/38] | French: | DERIVES D'AMINOACETONITRILE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LE CONTROLE DE PARASITES | [2004/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 01.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 18.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0953565 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-22 * page 24 - page 28; table 3 * * page 55 - page 56; claim -; table 5 *; | [AP]WO0249641 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-22* page 7 - page 17; tables 1,2 * |